|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2889.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2905.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 2017.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 9).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 1586.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 1351.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1223.).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 1).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|