BILL NUMBER: AB 725AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 4, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 25, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Jones and Torres (Coauthors: Assembly Members Hall and Price Block, Blumenfield, Hall, Price, and Portantino ) ( Coauthor: Senator DeSaulnier Coauthors: Senators DeSaulnier and Florez ) FEBRUARY 26, 2009 An act to amend Section 11629.84 of the Insurance Code, relating to auto insurance. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 725, as amended, Jones. Auto insurance: low-cost automobile insurance. Existing law establishes, within the California Automobile Assigned Risk Plan, a low-cost automobile insurance program. Existing law establishes the low-cost automobile insurance program in several specified counties and makes the expansion to all other counties in California subject to a determination of need made by the Insurance Commissioner following a public meeting, as specified. Existing law provides for the issuance of automobile liability policies pursuant to this program under specified terms and conditions, and provides that a policy so issued satisfies specified requirements regarding financial responsibility. Existing law provides that the low-cost automobile insurance program shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2011. This bill would instead provide that the low-cost automobile insurance program shall remain in effect until January 1, 2016. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 11629.84 of the Insurance Code is amended to read: 11629.84. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2016, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2016, deletes or extends that date.