08/27/2009 | In committee: Held under submission. | |||
07/13/2009 | In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file. | |||
07/06/2009 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
06/23/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 23). | |||
06/11/2009 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
06/02/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/01/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1871.) | |||
05/29/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/29/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/15/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 14). | |||
03/23/2009 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | |||
02/27/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | |||
02/26/2009 | Read first time. To print. |