|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 215, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 7 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2970.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 47. Noes 29. Page 2971.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 17. Page 2075.)
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 29. Page 756.)
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (March 17).
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
12/16/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 15. Read first time.
|
|
|
|
12/15/2008
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|