|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 3191.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 3197.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 16. Page 2157.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (August 24).
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 14). Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 1719.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Action rescinded and record expunged whereby a final roll call vote was taken.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|