|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 2013.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1456.)
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|