06/17/2010 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
06/24/2009 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/17/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/11/2009 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
05/27/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/26/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1671.) | |||
05/18/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/14/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 13). | |||
05/04/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 30). | |||
04/27/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
04/23/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/27/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | |||
02/26/2009 | Read first time. To print. |