|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 469, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1925.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on F. & A.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1365.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|