|
09/28/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 46. Noes 29. Page 6906.)
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 5030.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 28. Noes 0. Page 4959.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 17. Noes 15. Page 4850.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Padilla. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4850.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From Consent Calendar. To third reading. To inactive file on motion of Senator Simitian.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 987.)
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|