|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 2174.)
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 29. Page 1715.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Action rescinded and record expunged whereby a final roll call vote was taken.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|