|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 560, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6373.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6376.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4587.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to JR 61(b)(14).
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 29). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 3902.)
|
|
|
|
01/26/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (January 21).
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. by unanimous consent, and then be re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|