|
12/10/2009
|
(Corrected December 10.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1756.) From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 16).
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
In committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 2036.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. (Corrected June 10.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|