06/15/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/09/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
06/30/2009 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
06/04/2009 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
05/21/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/21/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 7. Page 1617.) | |||
05/18/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/14/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (May 13). | |||
05/06/2009 | In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |||
02/27/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | |||
02/26/2009 | Read first time. To print. |