05/21/2009 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/14/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/14/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1453.) | |||
05/12/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/11/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. | |||
05/06/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 5). | |||
05/05/2009 | Read second time and amended. | |||
05/04/2009 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 22). | |||
04/15/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
04/14/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/13/2009 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED. | |||
02/27/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | |||
02/26/2009 | Read first time. To print. |