|
08/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2009
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1828.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (March 24).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
12/17/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 16.
|
|
|
|
12/16/2008
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|