|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 372, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 3191.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 3198.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 16. Page 2211.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (August 27).
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 1804.) In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 1932.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|