|
02/04/2010
|
Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Ordered to third reading. To inactive file on motion of Senator Lowenthal.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1365.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|