|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 349, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6797.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 2. Page 4787.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
From committee: That the measure be returned with further amendments to the Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (August 11.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From inactive file. To second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Wolk.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 16. Noes 21. Page 2335.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Wolk. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2335.)
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (August 27). (received by desk August 28, 2009 pursuant to JR61(a)(11))
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 28. Page 1733.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 13).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|