|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 75, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 1763.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1829.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 1).
|
|
|
|
03/10/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
12/18/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 17. Read first time.
|
|
|
|
12/17/2008
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|