|
06/29/2010
|
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Reconsideration granted. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 27. Page 2264.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 38. Noes 27. Page 2200.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 8).
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1760.). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|