|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 122, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/24/2009
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2563.)
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 1759.)
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1351.)
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 1).
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|