02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
05/11/2009 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/27/2009 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/20/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/23/2009 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
02/27/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | |||
02/26/2009 | Read first time. To print. |