02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
05/28/2009 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/20/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/28/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 28). | |||
04/22/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 21). | |||
04/16/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. | |||
04/15/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/26/2009 | Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and PUB. S. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/26/2009 | Read first time. To print. |