|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2889.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2906.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 3. Page 2016.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1616.)
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|