|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 124, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1766.)
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1767.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|