|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 47. Noes 30. Page 3079.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 2889.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 2009.)
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 30. Page 1725.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 6).
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|