|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 472, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 62. Noes 17. Page 3368.)
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2379.)
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 5.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 1959.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|