|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 253, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 74. Noes 3. Page 2801.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1968.)
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1466.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5).
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|