06/18/2009 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |||
06/04/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/03/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 28. Page 2064.) | |||
06/02/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/01/2009 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |||
05/29/2009 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28). | |||
05/06/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/22/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 22). | |||
03/23/2009 | Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/26/2009 | Read first time. To print. |