|
07/06/2009
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 29. Page 1763.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|