|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 16. Page 2220.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 28. Page 1531.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|