|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 125, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1667.)
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1241.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 1).
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|