|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 49. Noes 28. Page 3081.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 2064.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 17).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 29. Page 1343.)
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 1).
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|