|
08/31/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Blakeslee.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1977.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 759.)
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (March 24).
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
12/22/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 21.
|
|
|
|
12/19/2008
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|