06/24/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/18/2009 | Referred to Com. on B., F. & I. | |||
06/03/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/02/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1919.) | |||
05/13/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/12/2009 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |||
05/11/2009 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 6). | |||
04/22/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |||
04/21/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/23/2009 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/26/2009 | Read first time. To print. |