|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 475, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3187.)
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2132.)
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1241.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|