|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 7 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2126.)
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 14).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 32. Page 1921.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 12).
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|