|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 76, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Withdrawn from Governor. Ordered returned to enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1428.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 17).
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1174.)
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 1).
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/07/2009
|
(Corrected January 7.)
|
|
|
|
01/05/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
12/23/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 22.
|
|
|
|
12/22/2008
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|