|
02/02/2010
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2010
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 16).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|