|
10/14/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 2529.)
|
|
|
|
09/12/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 22. Noes 1. Page 2454.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Cedillo. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2454.)
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 2256.) From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (September 8). Senate Rule 29.10 suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2280.)
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. Joint Rule 61(a)(12) suspended. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2222.) From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1733.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|