|
09/25/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6790.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6608.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 4672.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 2).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
12/17/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Corrected January 11.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 3. Page 2037.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|