|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 350, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 60. Noes 17. Page 6639.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (August 24).
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4455.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 2).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2019.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1819.).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|