02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
01/06/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/22/2009 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |||
04/16/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |||
04/15/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/26/2009 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/26/2009 | Read first time. To print. |