02/01/2010 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
01/12/2010 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
01/04/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
04/29/2009 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/21/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/26/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
03/25/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/23/2009 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/26/2009 | Read first time. To print. |