|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 479, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2889.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2910.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2023.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 24).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to Consent Calendar. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (July 15).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1629.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 13).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|