02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
05/12/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/07/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
05/06/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/13/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. by unanimous consent. | |||
03/26/2009 | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD. | |||
02/27/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | |||
02/26/2009 | Read first time. To print. |