|
09/28/2010
|
(Corrected September 28.)
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 3295.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 2333.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 5.) (August 27). (received by desk August 28, 2009 pursuant to JR61(a)(11))
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 15). Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 1862.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|