California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB838 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 09/10/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 838ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 4, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JUNE 2, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Swanson FEBRUARY 26, 2009 An act to add Section 142.8 to the Labor Code, relating to working conditions. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 838, Swanson. Occupational safety and health. The existing California Occupational Safety and Health Act of 1973 was enacted to assure safe and healthful working conditions by authorizing the enforcement of effective standards, assisting and encouraging employers to maintain safe and healthful working conditions, and by providing for research, information, education, training, and enforcement in the field of occupational safety and health. The Occupational Safety and Health Board, an independent entity within the Department of Industrial Relations, has exclusive authority to adopt occupational safety and health standards within the state. This bill would require the Occupational Safety and Health Standards Board, by July 1, 2011, to adopt a standard for controlling the risk of occurrence of heat illness where employees work indoors. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 142.8 is added to the Labor Code, to read: 142.8. On or before July 1, 2011, the board shall adopt an occupational safety and health standard for controlling the risk of occurrence of heat illness where employees work indoors.