|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 374, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3152.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3168.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2205.)
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1606.)
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From Consent Calendar. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 1).
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|