BILL NUMBER: AB 857AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 1, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 1, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 14, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Galgiani and Mendoza (Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Coto) (Coauthor: Assembly Member Arambula) FEBRUARY 26, 2009 An act to add Section 14236 to the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to workforce development , and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately . LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 857, as amended, Galgiani. Workforce development: one-stop career center systems. (1) The The federal Workforce Investment Act of 1998 provides for workforce investment activities, including activities in which states may participate. Existing law contains various programs for job training and employment investment, including work incentive and employment training outreach programs. Existing law, the California Workforce Investment Act declares that it is the intent of the Legislature to deliver comprehensive workforce services to jobseekers, students, and employers through a system of one-stop career centers to, among other things, make job outreach, intake, job search and placement assistance, and other related services available in one location. Existing law provides for the payment of unemployment compensation benefits to eligible unemployed persons during the period that the person is unemployed, and requires the Employment Development Department to implement and administer the unemployment compensation program. This bill would require the department , on or before July 1, 2010, to provide in-person unemployment benefit assistance at all in at least one comprehensive state one-stop career centers and workforce service offices center in each workforce area , as prescribed. The bill would require that the unemployment benefit assistance services required to be provided at these one-stop career centers be funded with existing moneys available to the department for the administration of the unemployment compensation program. (2) This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. Vote: 2/3 majority . Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 14236 is added to the Unemployment Insurance Code, to read: 14236. (a) Notwithstanding On or before July 1, 2010, and notwithstanding any other law, the department shall provide in-person unemployment benefit assistance at all in at least one comprehensive state one-stop career centers and department workforce service offices center in each workforce area, as defined by the Workforce Investment Act , as follows: (1) The department shall ensure that customer service personnel at those career centers are fully trained regarding the policy, laws, and regulations governing eligibility, claims processing, and procedures for the payment of unemployment compensation benefits to eligible individuals. (2) Printed information regarding eligibility and the process for filing claims for unemployment compensation benefits shall be made available at all one-stop career centers. (b) The unemployment benefit assistance services required to be provided at one-stop career centers pursuant to subdivision (a) shall be funded with existing moneys available to the department for the administration of the unemployment insurance compensation program. SEC. 2. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order to make necessary statutory changes, as soon as possible, to provide urgently needed assistance to the state's unemployed workers and promote economic recovery, it is necessary that this act take effect immediately.